Edmonds, Gillian Elizabeth Antoniadis (CPSO#: 76383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: Edmonds, Gillian Elizabeth (used until: 11 Feb 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edmonds-Antoniadis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Edmonds ( CPSO# 76383 )
Dr. G. Antoniadis ( CPSO# 60931 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200

Business Address:
Wingham & District Hospital
285 Catherine Street
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Business Address:
271 Frances Street
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN ELIZABETH ANTONIADIS EDMONDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDMONDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003