Ekong, Enobong Inem Arit (CPSO#: 96950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sound Care Medical Centre
Suite 560- 1145 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Phone: 613-738-2378
Fax: 613-738-2653
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Appletree Medical Group
150 Katimavik Rd
Kanata ON  K2L 4A2
Canada
Phone: 613-482-0118
Fax: 613-702-0248
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Enobong Ekong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ekong ( CPSO# 96950 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Group
150 Katimavik Road
Ottawa ON  K2L 4A2
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
Sound Care Medical Centre
560 - 1145 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Phone Number: (613) 738-2378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Dec 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 9, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Enobong Inem Arit
            Ekong, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ekong to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. ENOBONG INEM ARIT EKONG
                                          ("Dr. Ekong")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ekong, certificate of registration number 96950, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that I previously entered into an undertaking
                  dated July 11, 2017, to, among other things, undergo an assessment of my
                  hospital-based obstetrical/gynecological practice (my "2017
                  Undertaking"). 

            (4)   I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that I do not currently have hospital
                  privileges and as a result my hospital-based obstetrical/gynecological
                  practice is not able to be assessed at this time under my 2017
                  Undertaking.

            (5)   I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original
                  copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, I will be released from my 2017
                  Undertaking.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Ekong, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately. 

            (7)   I, Dr. Ekong, undertake that I will not resume a hospital-based
                  obstetrical and/or gynecological practice until I have provided the
                  College with at least fifteen (15) days' notice of my intention to do so,
                  including my intended practice location. 

            (8)   Assessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ekong, undertake that, approximately six (6) months of
                        continuous clinical practice after I have resumed a hospital-based
                        obstetrical and/or gynecological practice as set out in B(7) above,
                        I will participate in an assessment of my practice ("the
                        Assessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge that the Assessment may include
                        a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge and undertake that if I resume a
                        hospital-based practice in only one of obstetrics or gynecology,
                        rather than both areas at the same time, I will continue to be
                        obliged to give notice to the College under B(7) when I intend to
                        resume a hospital-based practice in the other area, and to undergo
                        an Assessment of that area under B(8)(a) as well, approximately six
                        (6) months after resuming its hospital-based practice. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ekong, undertake to co-operate fully with the Assessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that the Assessor(s) may discuss any
                        issues or concerns arising from the Assessment with my prior
                        Clinical Supervisor(s). I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Assessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Ekong, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(e) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Ekong, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                  (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR Committee has
                        identified in its decision referenced in section (8)(e) as terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ekong, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ekong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form attached hereto as Appendix "A." 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that if I breach any provision of this
                  Undertaking it may be an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ekong, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Ekong entered into a prior undertaking with the College
                              which obliged her to undergo an assessment of her
                              hospital-based obstetrical and gynecological practice, but
                              was unable to undergo the assessment at the scheduled time as
                              she has ceased to have a hospital-based obstetrical and
                              gynecological practice. As a result:
                  
                                    Dr. Ekong will provide at least fifteen (15) days'
                                    notice to the College when she intends to resume a
                                    hospital-based obstetrical and/or gynecological
                                    practice. 
                  
                                    Dr. Ekong's hospital-based obstetrical and
                                    gynecological practices will be assessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within six (6) months of
                                    continuous clinical practice following her resumption
                                    of hospital-based practice. If she initially resumes
                                    practice in only one of hospital-based obstetrics or
                                    gynecology, she will remain obliged to provide notice
                                    to the College prior to resuming a hospital-based
                                    practice in the other area, and to undergo an
                                    assessment of that other area within six (6) months of
                                    resuming practice in it as well. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Ekong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Ekong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Ekong, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff, and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Assessment;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   which comes to their attention in the course of the Assessment and
                        which they reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm
                        to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Enobong Inem Arit Ekong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 9, 2018:

Dr. Ekong entered into a prior undertaking with the College which obliged her to undergo an assessment of her hospital-based obstetrical and gynecological practice, but was unable to undergo the assessment at the scheduled time as she has ceased to have a hospital-based obstetrical and gynecological practice. As a result:

Dr. Ekong will provide at least fifteen (15) days’ notice to the College when she intends to resume a hospital-based obstetrical and/or gynecological practice.

Dr. Ekong’s hospital-based obstetrical and gynecological practices will be assessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of continuous clinical practice following her resumption of hospital-based practice. If she initially resumes practice in only one of hospital-based obstetrics or gynecology, she will remain obliged to provide notice to the College prior to resuming a hospital-based practice in the other area, and to undergo an assessment of that other area within six (6) months of resuming practice in it as well.