El Saidi, Mohammed Abdel Latif Mahmoud Mohammed (CPSO#: 86623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road,
Suite 514,
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: 905-997-7107
Fax: 866-253-5553
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

New Jane Medical Centre,
911 Jane Street,
Toronto ON  M6N 4C6
Canada
Phone: 647-345-5855
Fax: 647-345-5057
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Niagara Health System,
1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammed El Saidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. El Saidi ( CPSO# 86623 )

Business Address:
911A Jane Street
Toronto ON  M6N 4C6
Phone Number: (647) 345-5855

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDEL LATIF MAHMOUD MOHAMMED EL SAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL SAIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2010