ElAlfy, Ahmed Mahmoud Ibrahim (CPSO#: 85434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King St. West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

701 Main Street West - Unit 100
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Canada
Phone: 289-768-7246
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AME ElAlfy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. ElAlfy ( CPSO# 85434 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
101 - 240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (647) 478-8462

Business Address:
701 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Phone Number: (289) 768-7246

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED MAHMOUD IBRAHIM ELALFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELALFY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2010