El-Assar, Dalia Shaban Dawoud (CPSO#: 97647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: 5198049234
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 the boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N0B4
Canada
Phone: 519-279-4098
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Assar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. El-Assar ( CPSO# 97647 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Business Address:
100 The Board Walk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B1
Phone Number: (519) 279-4098

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALIA SHABAN DAWOUD EL-ASSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-ASSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Dec 2015 to 04 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2016