Elahi, Ayesha Attia (CPSO#: 95313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fountain Medical and Wellness
Unit 14
9425 Leslie Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3N7
Phone: (416) 642-5932
Fax: (905) 737-4773
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ayesha A. Elahi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elahi ( CPSO# 95313 )

Business Address:
Fountain Medical and Wellness
Unit 14
9425 Leslie Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3N7
Phone Number: (416) 542-5932

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYESHA ATTIA ELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014