Elias, Rami (CPSO#: 92954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suit 302
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 741-6060
Fax: (416) 741-6161
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elias Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Elias ( CPSO# 92954 )

Business Address:
302 - 100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 741-6060

Business Address:
4303 Village Centre Court
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Phone Number: (905) 949-6999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMI ELIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015