Elmazariky, Nada Mohamed Ali Sayed (CPSO#: 95536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 7W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elmazariky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Elmazariky ( CPSO# 95536 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 7W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADA MOHAMED ALI SAYED ELMAZARIKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMAZARIKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016