Elmistekawy, El Sayed Mohammed El Sayed Hendawy (CPSO#: 85322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa
40 Ruskin Street, H3- 3313A
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 978-5555
Fax: (613) 761-4807
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. El Sayed Elmistekawy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elmistekawy ( CPSO# 85322 )

Business Address:
Division of Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa
40 Ruskin Street
H3-3313A
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 978-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 01 Jul 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  El Sayed Mohammed El Sayed Hendawy Elmistekawy may practise medicine
                  only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Cardiac  Surgery,  University of Ottawa, in which Dr.
                        Elmistekawy holds an academic appointment  at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Elmistekawy   no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report indicating that Dr. Elmistekawy's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive  an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Elmistekawy's
                        certificate   of  registration,  following  consideration  of   the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  1,  2014.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2021.