Elser, Christine (CPSO#: 83043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Universitat Ulm, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Marvelle Koffler Breast Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 1286
600 University Avneue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-3202
Fax: (416) 586-4545
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4818
Fax: (416) 946-6546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 20 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 20 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Jun 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Christine Elser may practise medicine independently in Medical Oncology.