Elsharif, Adell Abdusalam (CPSO#: 82330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Medical Bariatric Clinic
100 W 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: 905 5221155 Ext. 37327
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2757 KING ST EAST
ST JOSEPH'S HEALTHCARE HAMILTON
DIABETES CLINIC
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elsharif Shbash Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elsharif ( CPSO# 82330 )
Dr. I. Shbash ( CPSO# 82345 )

Business Address:
Unit 12
1300 Garth Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 4L9
Phone Number: (905) 575-0611

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare
Medical Bariatric Clinic
100 W 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADELL ABDUSALAM ELSHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSHARIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2005 to 04 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 05 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013