Ens, Andrea Rae Doris (CPSO#: 90009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858138
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Brokenshire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ens ( CPSO# 90009 )
Dr. J. Brokenshire ( CPSO# 94895 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Emergency Services
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6882

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA RAE DORIS ENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2009 to 20 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2010 to 12 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2015