Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Male
Languages Spoken: English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
6 - 2111 Dunwin Drive, Mississauga, Ontario, L5L 3C1, Tel: 905-828-0990, Fax: 905-828-1043.
(1 of 2) As from 4:00 p.m., June 13, 2018, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term, condition and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Erez Tamari: (i) Dr. Tamari shall not engage in the practice of general family medicine or be the primary care provider for any patient whatsoever; (ii) Dr. Tamari's practice shall be restricted to: (a) performing minor surgical procedures in an office-based setting. This includes assessing and preparing a patient for the minor procedure, as well as providing follow-up and treatment of related complications stemming from those procedures; and (b) surgical assisting in a hospital-based setting, provided that a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario is in attendance and performing the surgery; (iii) Commencing immediately, Dr. Tamari shall maintain a log of all requests for medical records and third party reports made by patients, other physicians or third parties. The Log shall indicate when such requests were made and when they were fulfilled (the "Log"), and Dr. Tamari shall submit this Log to the College on a monthly basis for an indefinite period of time. For greater clarity, Dr. Tamari is responsible for maintaining the Log and submitting it to the College during the time that his certificate of registration is suspended; (iv) Within sixty (60) days of the date of the receipt of valid patient consent, Dr. Tamari shall deliver all existing medical records to all patients and/or third parties included in the Notice of Hearing, including the medical records of those family members referenced in the underlying complaints of the patients included in the Notice of Hearing. The receipt of patient consents and delivery of medical records to the patients and family members addressed in this paragraph, shall be included in the Log, referenced in paragraph 4(iii) above; (v) Dr. Tamari shall retain and employ an administrative assistant who will be present at all times that Dr. Tamari is practising in his office; (vi) Dr. Tamari shall participate in and successfully complete one-on-one individualized educational instruction in ethics with an instructor approved by the College, and provide proof thereof to the College within six (6) months of the date of this Order; (vii) Upon his return to practice, Dr. Tamari shall practise under the supervision of a College-approved supervisor or supervisors (the "Supervisor(s)") who will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule "A". For a period of twelve (12) months thereafter, the Supervisor shall supervise the management of Dr. Tamari's practice. The supervision of his practice management shall contain the following elements: (a) The Supervisor will meet with Dr. Tamari in person a minimum of once a month; (b) The Supervisor will review the Log and corresponding charts, as necessary, to ensure the timely provision of complete records and reports, and, in addition, ten (10) current patient charts selected on a random basis by the Supervisor to ensure accessibility, legibility and completeness; (c) Dr. Tamari shall fully cooperate with, and shall abide by any recommendations of his Supervisor, including any recommended practice management improvements and ongoing professional development; (d) The Supervisor will submit written reports to the College, at minimum, once per month, for the first three (3) months, and every other month thereafter; (e) If a Supervisor who has given an undertaking in the form attached at Schedule "A" to this Order is unwilling or unable to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Tamari shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time; (f) If Dr. Tamari is unable to obtain a Supervisor in accordance with paragraph 4(vii) of this Order, he shall cease practising medicine immediately until such time as he has done so, and the fact that he has ceased practising medicine will constitute a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration until that time. (viii)Dr. Tamari shall inform the College of each and every location where he practises in any jurisdiction (his "Practice Location(s)") within five (5) days of returning to practice and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location. (ix) Dr. Tamari shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Location(s) and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. (x) Dr. Tamari shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the terms of this Order. (xi) Dr. Tamari shall consent to the College making enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, including his administrative assistant, in order for the College to monitor and enforce his compliance with the terms of this Order. (2 of 2) As from 11:59 p.m., May 18, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Erez Tamari: 2. a. Dr. Tamari shall maintain a log of requests for third party reports and medical records, which shall indicate when such requests were made and when they were fulfilled (the "Log"); b. Dr. Tamari shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program in practice management with a preceptor who is to be approved by the College in its sole discretion and who has within forty-five days of the date of this Order signed an Undertaking to the College in the form attached hereto as Schedule "A". Termination of the preceptorship shall be at the sole discretion of the College, but shall in any case not occur until either six (6) months have passed, or two positive successive reports from the preceptor have been received by the College, whichever occurs later. Dr. Tamari shall abide by all recommendations of his preceptor with respect to practice improvements and/or professional development; c. Within twelve (12) months of completing the preceptorship required by paragraph 2(b) above, Dr. Tamari shall undergo a re-assessment with regard to practice management by a College-appointed Assessor. The assessment will include a review of Dr. Tamari's Log. Dr. Tamari shall abide by all recommendations with regard to practice management made by the College-appointed Assessor. The Assessor shall report the results of this assessment to the College; d. Dr. Tamari shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order; e. Dr. Tamari shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the terms of this Order.
Committee: Discipline Decision Date: 13 Jun 2018 Summary:
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF) Hearing Date(s): June 13 2018
Committee: Discipline Decision Date: 18 May 2012 Summary:
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF) Appeal: No Appeal Hearing Date(s): May 18, 2012
Committee: Discipline Decision Date: 03 Apr 2000 Summary:
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF) Appeal: No Appeal Hearing Date(s): Apr 03, 2000
On January 17, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Brampton, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Tamari.