Erfaei, Afaf Ahmed Esseid (CPSO#: 78509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lifelabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530 Ext. 42944
Fax: (416) 213-4206
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Elhadi Husien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husien ( CPSO# 71809 )
Dr. A. Erfaei ( CPSO# 78509 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital (K-W)
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
106A - 525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 742-3341

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFAF AHMED ESSEID ERFAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERFAEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 26 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2004 to 26 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2013 to 17 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2012