Ernjakovic, Milan (CPSO#: 89437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Novi Sad, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: (905) 707-5008
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 905 848 7557
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan Ernjakovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 30 2017


Corporation Name: Milan Ernjakovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ernjakovic ( CPSO# 89437 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 1225
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Business Address:
Suite 510
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILAN ERNJAKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERNJAKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2015