Esufali, Zakir Hussein (CPSO#: 74047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2561
Fax: (416) 495-2879
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zakir Esufali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Zakir Esufali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Esufali ( CPSO# 74047 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 638-5889

Business Address:
105 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5

Business Address:
4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4

Business Address:
300 - 5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Operating Room
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2561

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAKIR HUSSEIN ESUFALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESUFALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2004