Evans, Andrea Blair (CPSO#: 95580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-5550
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evans & Dr. Caudarella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Evans ( CPSO# 95580 )
Dr. A. Caudarella ( CPSO# 97953 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
17th Floor, Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5N 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 860-6696

Business Address:
555 University
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
30 Isabella Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2P7
Phone Number: (416) 924-4640

Business Address:
3079 Danforth Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1L 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 693-8677

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA BLAIR EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015