Fadel, Marc (CPSO#: 84654)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre for
Mental Health Sciences
Building 5
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 430-4055
Fax: (905) 430-4020
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: 705-743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC FADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011