Faghih, Amir Hossein (CPSO#: 89788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Ext. 6030
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Faghih Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Faghih ( CPSO# 89788 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR HOSSEIN FAGHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAGHIH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 12 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 13 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2013