Fahmy, Nader Sayed (CPSO#: 89107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 100
81 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 1N1
Phone: (905) 648-9868
Fax: (905) 648-6524
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N.S. Fahmy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fahmy ( CPSO# 89107 )

Business Address:
100 - 81 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 648-9868

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADER SAYED FAHMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAHMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010