Fantham-Tremblay, Neva Virginia (CPSO#: 93548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: Fantham, Neva Virginia (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 478-7300
Fax: (705) 478-8884
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neva Fantham-Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fantham-Tremblay ( CPSO# 93548 )

Business Address:
203 - 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 478-7300

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEVA VIRGINIA FANTHAM-TREMBLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTHAM-TREMBLAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2015