Farcnik, Karl Darko (CPSO#: 57033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
120 Carleton Street
Toronto ON  M5A 4K2
Phone: (416) 928-2226
Fax: (416) 928-6778
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 7-M406
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 3293
Fax: (416) 603-5292
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

280 Taylor Road
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1J9
Canada
Phone: (705) 646-1382
Fax: (416) 928-6778
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farcnik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Farcnik ( CPSO# 57033 )

Business Address:
412 - 120 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5A 4K2

Business Address:
280 Taylor Road
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1J9
Phone Number: (705) 646-1382

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARL DARKO FARCNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARCNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1987