Farid Araki, Keyghobad (CPSO#: 85535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health ARF Site
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Farid Araki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Farid Araki ( CPSO# 85535 )

Business Address:
The Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health ARF Site
60 White Squirrel Way
Suite 108
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEYGHOBAD FARID ARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARID ARAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 16 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013