Farooq, Muryum (CPSO#: 87065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
1253 Wilson Strert
Toronto
Toronto ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (416) 2421000 Ext. 48000
Fax: 416-242-1069
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muryum Farooq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farooq ( CPSO# 87065 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURYUM FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 21 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013