Farooqui, Susanne (CPSO#: 90824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Tracy, Susanne (used until: 01 Feb 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington District Memorial Hosp.
Department of General Surgery
194 Talbot Street West, 3rd Floor
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-4933
Fax: (519) 322-1952
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susanne Farooqui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Farooqui ( CPSO# 90824 )

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
Department of General Surgery
3rd Floor
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Jun 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 May 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 May 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Susanne Tracy may practice medicine independently in general surgery, only. 

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)