Farrugia, Patricia Ruth (CPSO#: 90581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Foot and Ankle Institute
1508 Upper James St
Hamilton ON  L9B 1K3
Phone: 9053854251
Fax: 9053851414
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Catharines General Hospital
Department of Surgery
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 9053784647 Ext. 45650
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Orthopedic Surgery
237 Barton St. E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 9055270271 Ext. 46607
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Jurvanski Hospital
Department of Orthopaedic Surgery
699 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 46607
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5801
Fax: (416) 603-3437
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 29 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA RUTH FARRUGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRUGIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017