Fayad, Ashraf Ahmed (CPSO#: 75625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4940
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fayad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fayad ( CPSO# 75625 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B3
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Aug 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Ashraf Ahmed Fayad may practise medicine independently in anaesthesiology.