Fefelova, Evgeniya Victorovna (CPSO#: 89248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Vladivostok State Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
630 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 0W5
Phone: (705) 252-6935
Fax: (705) 252-6937
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fefelova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fefelova ( CPSO# 89248 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
225 Mapleview Drive East
Barrie ON  L4N 0W5
Phone Number: (705) 252-6935

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVGENIYA VICTOROVNA FEFELOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEFELOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013