Ferdman, Doron (CPSO#: 95706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Medicine Teaching Un
Health For All
379 Church St, Suite 202
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: 905-472-2200
Fax: 905-472-5662
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
13291 Yonge St #100
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-7759 Ext. 4
Fax: (905) 773-1325
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty St S
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Altum Health
Krembil Discovery Tower, 4th Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5092
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORON FERDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013