Ferre, Chantal (CPSO#: 95816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chantal Ferre Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ferre ( CPSO# 95816 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTAL FERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2015