Fesharaki, Maryam (CPSO#: 91276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
10 Headdon Gate
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 8A3
Phone: (905) 770-5661
Fax: (905) 770-7733
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM FESHARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FESHARAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016