Fewster, Robert Frederick (CPSO#: 86976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-1871
Fax: (519) 822-1990
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert F. Fewster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fewster ( CPSO# 86976 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-1871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT FREDERICK FEWSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEWSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009