Filipowska, Caroline Helena (CPSO#: 93723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: Pospisil, Caroline Helena (used until: 30 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room C753
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.H. Filipowska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Filipowska ( CPSO# 93723 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4037

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE HELENA FILIPOWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILIPOWSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2015