Fiorini, Cynthia Marie (CPSO#: 94199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical
3075 Hospital Gate, Suite 318
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 338-8303
Fax: (905) 815-9528
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cynthia M. Fiorini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fiorini ( CPSO# 94199 )

Business Address:
318-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 338-8303

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.   Cynthia  Marie  Fiorini  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  Paediatrics in an office setting, only.