Firouzabadi-Dashti, Roya (CPSO#: 85122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Brooklin Medical Centre
Suite 1A
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone: (905) 655-3321
Fax: (905) 655-4848
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7163 Yonge St.
Units 125,126,127
World on Yonge Medical Clinic
Thornhill ON  L3T0C6
Canada
Phone: 9055977275
Fax: 9055977276
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roya Firouzabadi-Dashti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Firouzabadi-Dashti ( CPSO# 85122 )

Business Address:
7163 Yonge Street
Suite 126
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C6
Phone Number: (905) 597-7275

Business Address:
The Brooklin Medical Centre
Suite 1A
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 655-3321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROYA FIROUZABADI-DASHTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIROUZABADI-DASHTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008