Firoz, Abu Taher Mohammad (CPSO#: 78765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Dhaka, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 212
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 553-2655
Fax: (905) 553-8655
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Firoz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Firoz ( CPSO# 78765 )

Business Address:
212 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 553-2655

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABU TAHER MOHAMMAD FIROZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIROZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jan 2003 to 05 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jan 2004 to 05 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2005