Foidart, Stephane Jean (CPSO#: 84402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
524 1st Avenue South
Kenora ON  P9N 1W5
Phone: (807) 468-3600
Fax: (807) 468-4440
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

34 Matheson St. S
Kenora ON  P9N 1T6
Canada
Phone: 807-468-7091
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Foidart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Foidart ( CPSO# 84402 )

Business Address:
524 1st Avenue South
Kenora ON  P9N 1W5
Phone Number: (807) 468-3600

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANE JEAN FOIDART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOIDART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2009