Ford, Peter Thomas (CPSO#: 55659)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Ford & Anne Holbrook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ford ( CPSO# 55659 )
Dr. A. Holbrook ( CPSO# 52730 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Mary Grace 6th Floor
Room G623A
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents seeking access to their medical records can contact Dr. Preshanthini Shanmugathasan (102193) at: 204 - 323 Wilson Rd E Ancaster ON L9G 4A8 Tel: 905-304-8367
Date Received: 15 Nov 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 2018