Forfar, Katie Ann (CPSO#: 89316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitewater Bromley CHC
20 Robertson Drive
Beachburg ON  K0J 1C0
Phone: (613) 582-3685
Fax: (613) 582-7095
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Caressent Care Retirement and LTC
12 Wren Drive
Cobden ON  K0J 1K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 646-2109
Fax: (613) 646-2182
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Forfar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Forfar ( CPSO# 89316 )

Business Address:
Whitewater Bromley CHC
20 Robertson Drive
Beachburg ON  K0J 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 582-3685

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATIE ANN FORFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010