Forman, Rachel Alizon (CPSO#: 72020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Agincourt Professional Centre
2330 Kennedy Road
Suite 317
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: (416) 609-8868
Fax: (416) 609-8711
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 1000
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-0926
Fax: (416) 585-2664
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Forman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Forman ( CPSO# 72020 )

Business Address:
Agincourt Professional Centre
Suite 317
2330 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 609-8868

Business Address:
1000 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-7727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL ALIZON FORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2000 to 31 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004