Fornazzari, Luis Reynaldo (CPSO#: 50577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Chile, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Memory Clinic - 17th Floor
Cardinal Carter Building
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 2680
Fax: (416) 864-5480
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Health Care Centre
Suite A6
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 696-9836
Fax: (416) 696-8080
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 08 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIS REYNALDO FORNAZZARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORNAZZARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1980 to 30 Jun 1980
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Research Fellows - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Research Fellows - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1998