Fraser-Roberts, Deborah Leigh (CPSO#: 71890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital, CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3591
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wabano Centre for Aboriginal Health
299 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 6B8
Canada
Phone: (613) 748-5999
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leigh Fraser-Roberts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fraser-Roberts ( CPSO# 71890 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
299 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 7G1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH LEIGH FRASER-ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER-ROBERTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 1997 to 22 Aug 1997
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2009