Freedman, Morris (CPSO#: 28334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre For Geriatric Care
Kimel Family Building, Room 656
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2444
Fax: (416) 785-2484
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morris Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Freedman ( CPSO# 28334 )

Business Address:
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Brain Health Centre, Room 656
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 784-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORRIS FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1978