French Merkley, Veronique (CPSO#: 79767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Care of the Elderly
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Bruyere Continuing Care
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262 Ext. 4066
Fax: (613) 562-4265
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERONIQUE FRENCH MERKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRENCH MERKLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 16 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006