Fried, Ben-Ari (CPSO#: 84655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital , WOHS
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 33554
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Eve and Ben-Ari Fried Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fried ( CPSO# 84655 )
Dr. E. Fried ( CPSO# 79058 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital-WOHS
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone Number: (905) 850-0004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEN-ARI FRIED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011