Furlonge, Dexter Andeev (CPSO#: 90611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 228
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 783-3375
Fax: (416) 783-3376
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7900 Hurontario Street
Suite 401
Brampton ON  L6Y0P6
Canada
Phone: 4162920330
Fax: 4162920331
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. A. Furlonge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Furlonge ( CPSO# 90611 )

Business Address:
228 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 783-3375

Business Address:
401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Trinidad and Tobago
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEXTER ANDEEV FURLONGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURLONGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2016