Gagarin, Ruben (CPSO#: 92276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Baskirian State Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1
Phone: (416) 281-7301
Fax: (416) 281-7465
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ruben Gagarin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gagarin ( CPSO# 92276 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1
Phone Number: (416) 281-7301

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBEN GAGARIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGARIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011