Gagnon, Michael Paul (CPSO#: 85425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
170 McEwan Drive
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone: (905) 951-7525
Fax: (905) 951-3419
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Gagnon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gagnon ( CPSO# 85425 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
170 McEwan Drive
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone Number: (905) 951-7525

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Feb 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PAUL GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2008