Galarraga-Carrero, Carlos Willy (CPSO#: 50608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Los Andes, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 290
180 King Street South
Waterloo ON  N2J 1P8
Phone: (519) 745-2621
Fax: (519) 745-7174
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sute 1011
20 Erb Street West
Waterloo ON  N2C1T2
Canada
Phone: 519-3715217
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Suite 11
945 3rd Avenue
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2K8
Canada
Phone: 519-371-5217
Fax: 519-371-5736
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Willy Galarraga-Carrero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Galarraga-Carrero ( CPSO# 50608 )

Business Address:
11-945 3rd Avenue
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2K8
Phone Number: (519) 371-5217

Business Address:
1101-20 Erb Street South
Waterloo ON  N2L 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 371-5217

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLOS WILLY GALARRAGA-CARRERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALARRAGA-CARRERO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1992