Gallimore, Christopher Hugh (CPSO#: 75180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 237-4901
Fax: (905) 237-4906
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gallimore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gallimore ( CPSO# 75180 )

Business Address:
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 237-4901

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 29 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER HUGH GALLIMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLIMORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 09 Jan 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2011